U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • November 04, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 15, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 08, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.