U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
  • November 30, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
  • November 04, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • October 20, 2022: [Disclosure]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 29, 2022: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • August 29, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 29, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.