U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Godsey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA Judgment]
  • April 01, 2025: [USCA 4th Circuit Memorandum]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Standard Plea Notice Order - Moon]
  • October 06, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • October 06, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 20, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Indictment]
  • August 10, 2022: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.