U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rangeley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Abstract Issued]
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 13, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Substantial Assistance]
  • December 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 05, 2022: [Substantial Assistance]
  • December 01, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • November 10, 2022: [SEALED Objections to PSR - Notice to Probation and Opposing Counsel Only]
  • November 03, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Appearance Bond]
  • August 12, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 11, 2022: [Consent to Proceed by Video Conference]
  • August 11, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • August 11, 2022: [Guilty Plea Form]
  • August 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 11, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 11, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 11, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.