U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Doss
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [SEALED PSR - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 02, 2022: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Urbanski Sentencing Scheduling Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Guilty Plea Hearing & Plea Entered]
  • August 25, 2022: [Consent to Allow United States Magistrate Judge to Accept Plea]
  • August 25, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.