U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Disclosure]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 28, 2022: [Pretrial Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2022: [In Person Appearance Rights]
  • September 28, 2022: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • September 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2022: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 29, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.