U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morris et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED PSR - Revised Final]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [SEALED PSR - Initial]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Factual Basis/Statement of Facts]
  • October 11, 2024: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.