U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Broadnax
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Arrangements Made]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.