U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00770
  • Case Name: White v. Holloway et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 11, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.