U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00017
  • Case Name: Parker v. Kennedy, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 14, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.