U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: Williams v. Young et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • May 06, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Respond]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Inaccurate Party Name]
  • March 17, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • March 17, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.