U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00184
  • Case Name: Richards v. Weber City Virginia et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order to Respond - Prisoner]
  • April 04, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • April 01, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Statement of Assets]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.