U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00828
  • Case Name: Williams Jr. v. Sgt. Allen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service Marshals]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Last Known Address - (1983 - For OAG use only)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Service (1983 OAG)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 OAG)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.