U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00187
  • Case Name: Barksdale v. Dotson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Statement of Assets]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.