U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00016
  • Case Name: Haynie v. Clarke et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • May 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 02, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 12, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • March 17, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • March 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.