U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Wolfe Williams & Austin v. West et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Response]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 30, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [More Definite Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certified Mail Return Receipt - U.S. Attorneys]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
  • March 18, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 18, 2025: [Deposit Funds]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Deposit Funds]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.