U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00142
  • Case Name: Dye v. Large et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Inaccurate Party Name]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 or Bivens)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 18, 2025: [Mail Returned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.