U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Jones et al v. Global Security Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.