U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00060
  • Case Name: Addison v. Gill et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 02, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Last Known Address - (1983 - For OAG use only)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Last Known Address - (1983 - For OAG use only)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Declination of Service - (1983 - For OAG use only)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.