U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00088
  • Case Name: Gibson et al v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Dismiss]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.