U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00143
  • Case Name: Robinette v. Jesse et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 or Bivens)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • April 10, 2025: [Letter/Request]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.