U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00013
  • Case Name: Quiero, Jr. v. Stiltner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Mail Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Interrogatories Propounded]
  • April 11, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 20, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 19, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.