U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00150
  • Case Name: Howard v. Kilgore et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter/Request]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Respond - Prisoner]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Declination of Service - (1983 - For OAG use only)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Discovery]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service]
  • March 31, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Service (1983 OAG)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 OAG)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • March 25, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.