U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00195
  • Case Name: Kornylak v. Property Manager et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Service (1983 OAG)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 OAG)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • April 04, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Transferred Out - District (closes case)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.