U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Mosley v. Allen Engineering Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • May 05, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 04, 2025: [70 Day Notice Letter Sent]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.