U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:17-cv-00084
  • Case Name: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. Nora Lee Seay et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Disbursement Made]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order for Release of Funds]
  • March 26, 2025: [Court Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Proposed Exhibits]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.