U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cv-00012
  • Case Name: Bartley et al v. General Motors LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • March 21, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.