U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00289
  • Case Name: Lipscomb v. Crout et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objections]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 04, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • March 21, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.