U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00201
  • Case Name: Marshall v. Meyer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Granting IFP (to be used in Prisoner cases ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Clerks Notice of Service (1983 OAG)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service - (1983 OAG)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • March 21, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.