U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice for Jury Trial or Guilty Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 25, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 25, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • March 24, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.