U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cv-00670
  • Case Name: Williams v. Oh et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order to Respond - Prisoner]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reopen Case]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.