U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00772
  • Case Name: Cooper v. Wallens Ridge State Prison et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 08, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 24, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.