U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00001
  • Case Name: Appleton v. Orange County School Board et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Support]
  • March 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.