U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Huggins v. Buitoni Food Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 17, 2025: [Minute Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference or Mediation]
  • April 01, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.