U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00749
  • Case Name: Madison v. Dotson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Affidavit in Opposition]
  • April 28, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: [Stay]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Respond]
  • March 26, 2025: [Roseboro Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Request for Production of Documents]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.