U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00213
  • Case Name: Gallop v. Dotson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Prisoner Service (2254)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent to Fee]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response]
  • April 17, 2025: [Letter/Request]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.