U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00220
  • Case Name: Thompson v. STU Designs LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [State Court Records]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Settlement Conference or Mediation]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Attorney - Updating Contact Information]
  • March 31, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.