U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00102
  • Case Name: Vyas v. Hutcheson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA]
  • May 01, 2025: [USCA Record Request]
  • May 01, 2025: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • May 01, 2025: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appeal Remark]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pro Se Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.