U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Amore et al v. American Association of Veterinary Clinicians et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 18, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.