U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:25-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Richards v. Parks
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 29, 2025: [Additional Evidence]
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 25, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 15, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.