U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:24-cv-00758
  • Case Name: Sublett v. Hisco, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.