U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00018
  • Case Name: Davis v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Requirement - Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Requesting State Court Record]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.