U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kiser
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 23, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance - Probation Officer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 09, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.