U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-mj-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Velasquez-Cal
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2025: [Brief /Memorandum]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Respond]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Stay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appearance Bond]
  • April 22, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Revoke]
  • April 22, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Interpreter Appointment Scheduled]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 09, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.