U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Callands
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Bill of Particulars]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Standard Plea Notice Order - Moon]
  • April 24, 2025: [Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sealed Document - Unredacted Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.