U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:23-cv-00442
  • Case Name: Nealson v. Reynolds, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response]
  • April 29, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 29, 2025: [Prisoner Miscellaneous Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [E-Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief / Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 14, 2025: [Letter/Request]
  • April 14, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.