U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00023
  • Case Name: Doe v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Set Aside]
  • April 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order to Respond]
  • April 25, 2025: [Set Aside]
  • April 24, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Applicable Party Document - use with another selection]
  • April 22, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Attorney - Updating Contact Information]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.