U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia

virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-mj-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez Hilario
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 29, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 29, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 29, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
  • April 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Log Notes with Certificate]
  • April 22, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice Rescheduling Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [SEALED Pretrial Bail Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.