open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:16-cv-00013
    Party Name:Hawkins v. United States of America
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Public Motion]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?38352
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =