open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00021
    Party Name:Lindsey v. USA
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Consent to Collection of Fees]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Court-Approved Form]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:December 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Confirmation Re Opening of Transferred Case]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?225413
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =